Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bala Shoury Thumma

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nellore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1908BornCheruvukumpalem
12 Dec 193526.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 196758.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nellore, India
22 Jun 196758.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Corniculana
11 Oct 196758.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corniculana
16 Mar 197061.2SucceededBishop of Nellore, India
4 Aug 197364.6ResignedBishop of Nellore, India
4 May 197970.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Nellore, India

MicroData Summary for Bala Shoury Thumma:
Bishop Bala Shoury Thumma (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nellore

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015