Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Warangal

Dioecesis Varangalensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 22 December 1952
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Hyderabad
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 24,702 (9,541 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Fatimanagar, Kazipet, Warangal-506004, A.P., India
  • Telephone: (0870)2459.128
  • Fax: 2459.499

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
22 December 1952ErectedDiocese of Hyderabad Diocese of Warangal (erected)
31 May 1976Territory LostArchdiocese of Hyderabad
Diocese of Warangal
Diocese of Nalgonda (erected)
18 January 1988Territory LostDiocese of Warangal Diocese of Khammam (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
197059,9315,000,0001.2%145461,3026958829ap1971
198076,9065,204,7531.5%2825531,4513926237ap1981
199039,0674,786,557.8%3116478312119730ap1991
199954,8526,091,639.9%5529846535734843ap2000
200055,5646,317,654.9%5729866465736043ap2001
200156,6256,576,725.9%5925846748836944ap2002
200256,9056,667,340.9%62309261810338044ap2003
200359,8607,078,532.8%6433976179947647ap2004
200462,4987,193,742.9%65361016189449949ap2005
201066,3857,724,845.9%765212851815652655ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013