Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Maipan

Bishop of Khammam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1944 BornManikamangalam
9 Jan 197126.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 199753.2AppointedBishop of Khammam, India
22 Aug 199753.5Ordained BishopBishop of Khammam, India

MicroData Summary for Paul Maipan:
Bishop Paul Maipan (born ) Bishop of Khammam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Khammam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013