Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sébastin-Théophille Neyret, M.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Vizagapatam

Titular Bishop of Olena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1802BornGiez, France
11 Mar 182623.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
31 Mar 184845.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Vizagapatam, India
31 Mar 184845.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Olena
24 Feb 184946.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olena
5 Nov 186260.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Vizagapatam, India

MicroData Summary for Sébastin-Théophille Neyret
Bishop Sébastin-Théophille Neyret M.S.F.S. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Vizagapatam

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 424
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016