Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Fennelly

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Madras, India

Titular Bishop of Thermopylae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1817Born
10 Jun 184325.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 186850.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Madras, India
7 Jul 186850.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
4 Oct 186850.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
3 May 188062.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Madras, India

MicroData Summary for Stephen Fennelly (VIAF: 36562393)
Bishop Stephen Fennelly (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Madras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle Town, Ireland
Ordained BishopSte Marie des Anges, Cathedral, Madras

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 548
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017