Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Dal PrÓ

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terni e Narni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1902BornChiuppano
18 Jul 192623.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 194845.5AppointedBishop of Terni e Narni, Italy
30 May 194845.6Ordained BishopBishop of Terni e Narni, Italy
10 Feb 197370.3ResignedBishop of Terni e Narni, Italy
6 Mar 199087.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Terni e Narni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Dal PrÓ:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Dal PrÓ (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Terni e Narni

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1948, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013