Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Giacomo Nonis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1927BornFossalta di Portogruaro
2 Jul 195023.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 198860.8AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
9 Apr 198861.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vicenza, Italy
6 Oct 200376.5RetiredBishop of Vicenza, Italy
15 Jul 201487.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Giacomo Nonis:
Bishop Pietro Giacomo Nonis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,552
  • d: CB, 15 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Jul 2014