Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abramo Freschi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1913Born
18 Jul 193724.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 197057.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
20 Jul 197057.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasbinca
13 Sep 197057.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasbinca
14 Apr 197763.8SucceededBishop of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy
19 Jul 198976.1RetiredBishop of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy
10 Feb 199682.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Abramo Freschi
Bishop Abramo Freschi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Concordia-Pordenone

EventPlace
Birth PlacePagnacco

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast