Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marco Cardinal

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Venezia {Venice}

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1925BornIzano
27 Mar 194822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Crema, Italy
22 Apr 197044.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
22 Apr 197044.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vulturia
17 May 197044.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vulturia
29 Jun 197045.0InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
7 Dec 197853.4AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
6 Jan 197953.5InstalledPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
30 Jun 197954.0Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jun 197954.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
5 Jan 200276.5RetiredPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
12 May 201488.8DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Cé:
Marco Cardinal (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
  • a cardinal for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • d: CB, 12 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Jul 2014