Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Mocellini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1906Born
13 Jul 193024.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Aug 195549.5AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
28 Oct 195549.7Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
1 Jan 196962.9AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
12 Mar 197771.0ResignedBishop of Adria, Italy
27 Sep 198983.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Mocellini
Bishop Giovanni Mocellini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaletto di Montagnana

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018