Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Maria Sartori

Deceased

Archbishop of Trento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1925BornVicenza
27 Jun 194822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
12 Mar 197751.6AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
24 Apr 197751.7Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
7 Dec 198762.4AppointedArchbishop of Trento, Italy
26 Sep 199873.2DiedArchbishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Sartori
Archbishop Giovanni Maria Sartori (born , died ) Archbishop of Trento

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 10 Feb 2016