Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giancarlo Maria Bregantini, C.S.S.

Archbishop of Campobasso-Boiano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1948 Born
13 Jun 197425.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
1 Jul 197829.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
12 Feb 199445.3AppointedBishop of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy
7 Apr 199445.5Ordained BishopBishop of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy
7 May 199445.6InstalledBishop of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy
8 Nov 200759.1AppointedArchbishop of Campobasso-Boiano, Italy
20 Jan 200859.3InstalledArchbishop of Campobasso-Boiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giancarlo Maria Bregantini (VIAF: 102969844)
Archbishop Giancarlo Maria Bregantini C.S.S. (born ) Archbishop of Campobasso-Boiano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDenno

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Campobasso-Boiano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,340

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast