Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Grano

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1887Born
14 Jun 191224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
17 Feb 195365.3AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
13 Dec 195871.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
13 Dec 195871.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Italy
27 Dec 195871.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
26 Jun 196779.6Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 196779.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Italy
15 Jul 196779.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
2 Apr 197688.4DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello

MicroData Summary for Carlo Grano
(VIAF: 39146217726109140631; WikiData: Q698055)
Carlo Cardinal Grano (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Marcello, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
  • a cardinal for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 36
  • 1967: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, [26] 6
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1958, Number 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024