Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Rocco Favale

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vallo della Lucania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1935Born
15 Jul 196227.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 198953.6AppointedBishop of Vallo della Lucania, Italy
1 May 198953.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vallo della Lucania, Italy
7 May 201175.8RetiredBishop of Vallo della Lucania, Italy
29 Jun 201882.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Vallo della Lucania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Rocco Favale
Bishop Giuseppe Rocco Favale (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vallo della Lucania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIrsina, Diocese of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)
Ordained BishopStade, Irsina, Archdiocese of Matera-Irsina
Death PlaceGravina in Puglia, Diocese of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,346
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 29 Jun 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast