Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Scandiffio

Archbishop Emeritus of Acerenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1928 BornPomarico
8 Jul 195122.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 198859.6AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy
9 Jul 198859.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy
27 Jul 200576.8RetiredArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Scandiffio:
Archbishop Michele Scandiffio (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Acerenza

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Acerenza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,563
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Nov 2013