Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donato De Bonis

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Castellum in Numidia

Titular See: (Prelate/Order of Malta)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1930BornPietragalla, Italy
5 Apr 195323.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 199362.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum in Numidia
25 Apr 199363.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum in Numidia
23 Apr 200171.0DiedTitular Bishop of Castellum in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Donato De Bonis:
Bishop Donato De Bonis (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Castellum in Numidia

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,071
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013