Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pasquale Macchi

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Loreto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1923Born
15 Jun 194622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
10 Dec 198865.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Loreto, Italy
6 Jan 198965.1Ordained BishopPrelate of Loreto, Italy
7 Oct 199672.9RetiredPrelate of Loreto, Italy
5 Apr 200682.4DiedPrelate Emeritus of Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Macchi (VIAF: 34578408)
Archbishop Pasquale Macchi (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Loreto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVarese, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Casciago, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,022
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • c1/loc: AM, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast