Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Nogaro

Bishop Emeritus of Caserta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1933 Born
29 Jun 195824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Udine, Italy
25 Oct 198248.8AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
9 Jan 198349.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
20 Oct 199056.8AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
16 Dec 199056.9InstalledBishop of Caserta, Italy
25 Apr 200975.3RetiredBishop of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Nogaro (VIAF: 51313709)
Bishop Raffaele Nogaro (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Caserta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGradisca di Sedegliano, Archdiocese of Udine
Ordained PriestSanta Maria Annunziata, Cathedral, Udine, Archdiocese of Udine
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Annunziata, Cathedral, Udine, Archdiocese of Udine

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caserta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,850
  • opd/c1/i: AM, 24 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Aug 2021

Quantcast