Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Farina

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1942BornMaddaloni
26 Jun 196624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Caserta, Italy
16 Feb 199956.8AppointedBishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy
17 Apr 199956.9Ordained BishopBishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy
25 Apr 200967.0AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
24 Sep 201371.4DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Farina:
Bishop Pietro Farina (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,500
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 24 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 24 Sep 2013