Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Doimo Munzani

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara)

Titular Archbishop of Tyana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1890BornZara
6 Apr 191322.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Aug 192635.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
13 Aug 192635.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
17 Oct 192635.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
16 Mar 193342.3AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
11 Dec 194858.0ResignedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
11 Dec 194858.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
28 Jan 195160.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Pietro Doimo Munzani:
Archbishop Pietro Doimo Munzani (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013