Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ciril Banic

Deceased

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1890Born
8 Sep 191323.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 195160.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
28 Mar 195160.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Corone
27 May 195160.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corone
24 Dec 196070.3AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
3 Feb 196170.4DiedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ciril Banic (VIAF: 129146094161300330572)
Bishop Ciril Banic (born , died ) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDolac Donji
Ordained BishopŠibenik

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1951, Number 52
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 32, Number 1,808
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast