Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josip Marija Carević

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

Titular Bishop of Aristium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1883BornMetkovic
28 Oct 190825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
13 Apr 192946.2AppointedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
4 Aug 192946.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
9 Feb 194057.0ResignedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
9 Feb 194057.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aristium
May 1945²62.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josip Marija Carević:
Bishop Josip Marija Carević (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1929, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013