Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franjo Uccelini-Tice

Deceased

Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1847Born
11 Jun 187123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
18 May 189446.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
18 May 189446.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
12 Aug 189447.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benda
18 Mar 189547.6AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
30 Sep 189548.1InstalledBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
1 Jun 193789.8DiedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Franjo Uccelini-Tice (VIAF: 305709577)
Bishop Franjo Uccelini-Tice (born , died ) Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLopud, Diocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
Ordained BishopDubrovnik, Diocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 146, and Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jul 2017