Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Zannoni

Deceased

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1831BornTrau
18 Mar 189564.0AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
25 Apr 190372.1DiedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Matteo Zannoni:
Bishop Matteo Zannoni (born , died ) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 517

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015