Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Carić

Deceased

Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1867BornSvirce
6 Oct 188922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
6 Dec 190639.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
6 Dec 190639.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
8 Dec 190639.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
8 Jun 191851.1AppointedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
17 May 192154.1DiedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Georg Carić:
Bishop Georg Carić (born , died ) Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1906, Number 77
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 348

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013