Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Albin Cardinal Dunajewski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Vitale, Valeria, Gervasio e Protasio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1817BornStanisławów
28 Jul 186144.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków, Poland
21 Apr 187962.1SelectedBishop of Kraków, Poland
15 May 187962.2ConfirmedBishop of Kraków, Poland
18 Jun 187962.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kraków, Poland
23 Jun 189073.3Elevated to Cardinal
4 Jun 189174.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Vitale, Valeria, Gervasio e Protasio
18 Jun 189477.3DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Albin Dunajewski:
Cardinal Albin Dunajewski (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
  • a cardinal for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 229, and Page 53
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1890

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013