Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwik Łętowski

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Ioppe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1786BornTarnawatka
26 Jan 181831.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Jan 181831.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 184558.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
17 Jun 184558.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
25 Aug 186881.9DiedTitular Bishop of Ioppe

MicroData Summary for Ludwik Łętowski:
Bishop Ludwik Łętowski (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Ioppe

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013