Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Joachim Goldtmann

Deceased

Bishop of Sandomierz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1782³BornWejherowo
22 Jun 180624.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 183856.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
17 Sep 183856.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
18 Nov 183856.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
25 Jan 184461.8AppointedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
27 Mar 185270.0DiedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Joachim Goldtmann:
Bishop Józef Joachim Goldtmann (born , died ) Bishop of Sandomierz

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,785
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 137, and Page 333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013