Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kaspar Jastrzębeic Borowski

Deceased

Bishop of Płock


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1802BornDrujensi
20 Dec 183028.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Apr 183129.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 184846.4AppointedBishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine
5 Dec 184846.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine
15 Mar 188381.1AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
15 Jan 188583.0DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Kaspar Jastrzębeic Borowski (VIAF: 161087350)
Bishop Kaspar Jastrzębeic Borowski (born , died ) Bishop of Płock

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 350, and Page 460
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016