Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Michal Prażmowski

Deceased

Bishop of Płock, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1768¹Born
1792¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 181850.2AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
7 Jun 181850.4Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
6 Feb 183668.0DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam Michal Prażmowski
Bishop Adam Michal Prażmowski (born 1768, died ) Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKosnin

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,127
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 310
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018