Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konstanty Wincenty Plejewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

Titular Bishop of Lagania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1767³BornGórzno
29 May 179023.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Jun 179023.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 182356.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
24 Nov 182356.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lagania
8 Feb 182456.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lagania
24 Feb 183870.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Konstanty Wincenty Plejewski:
Bishop Konstanty Wincenty Plejewski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,128
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 235
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013