Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Feliks Łukasz Lewiński

Deceased

Bishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1751³Born
4 Aug 177624.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 179442.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
12 Sep 179442.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrae
19 Mar 179543.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrae
29 Mar 181967.4AppointedBishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
5 Apr 182573.4DiedBishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Feliks Łukasz Lewiński
Bishop Feliks Łukasz Lewiński (born , died ) Bishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSrzeplen

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 210, and Page 454
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 219
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018