Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Jerzy Wilkxycki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

Titular Bishop of Flavias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1763BornPsary
2 Jun 178723.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
22 Sep 178724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
28 Jul 181753.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
28 Jul 181753.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Flavias
4 Oct 181855.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flavias
15 May 183167.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Jerzy Wilkxycki:
Bishop Jan Jerzy Wilkxycki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015