Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreas Wołłowicz

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1750BornBrodnia
1 Sep 177625.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Sep 177625.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 181968.3AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
4 Jul 181968.6Ordained BishopBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
9 Mar 182271.3DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Andreas Wołłowicz:
Bishop Andreas Wołłowicz (born , died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013