Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ladislas Adam Prosper Burzyński, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1755³Born
5 Jan 177317.4ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
19 Sep 177823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
17 Dec 181964.4AppointedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
19 Mar 182064.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
9 Sep 183075.1DiedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ladislas Adam Prosper Burzyński
Bishop Ladislas Adam Prosper Burzyński O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Sandomierz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWojakowicz

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 333
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast