Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Dobrzański

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz

Titular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1766³BornDobra
19 Sep 178923.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 181953.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland
17 Dec 181953.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia
23 Apr 182054.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia
1831¹64.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Dobrzański:
Bishop Alexander Dobrzański (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013