Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurycy Mateusz Wojakowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin

Titular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1773BornKarniewo
24 Sep 179623.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 182451.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
20 Dec 182451.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
27 Feb 182551.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
7 Feb 184571.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Maurycy Mateusz Wojakowski
Bishop Maurycy Mateusz Wojakowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 86
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016