Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Miaskowski

Deceased

Bishop of Warszawa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1744BornSmogozewo
25 Sep 176824.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Oct 179854.4AppointedBishop of Warszawa, Poland
9 Feb 180055.7Ordained BishopBishop of Warszawa, Poland
16 Nov 180460.5DiedBishop of Warszawa, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Miaskowski:
Bishop Józef Miaskowski (born , died ) Bishop of Warszawa

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 2
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 26 Jan 2015