Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Chrzciciel Albertrandi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa

Titular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1731BornWarszawa
18 Dec 179564.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa, Poland
18 Dec 179564.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
26 Jan 179664.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
10 Aug 180876.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Chrzciciel Albertrandi:
Bishop Jan Chrzciciel Albertrandi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 450
  • bd/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,411
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,797
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,980

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013