Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodozy Wisłocki, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Supraśl (Ukrainian), Belarus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1738³Born
7 Jun 176931.2Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
15 Jun 177840.3AppointedAdministrator of Supraśl (Ukrainian), Belarus
28 Mar 179961.0AppointedBishop of Supraśl (Ukrainian), Belarus
27 Apr 180062.1Ordained BishopBishop of Supraśl (Ukrainian), Belarus
10 May 180163.2DiedBishop of Supraśl (Ukrainian), Belarus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teodozy Wisłocki
Bishop Teodozy Wisłocki O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Supraśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRonerozniec

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 4
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 292
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018