Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwik Stanisław Górski, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Titular Bishop of Caesaropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1725BornRoćmirowa
15 Aug 174318.2ProfessedMember of Order of the Pious Schools
19 Dec 174924.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Pious Schools
26 Dec 174924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
17 Sep 178156.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
17 Sep 178156.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
1 Jun 178358.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
25 Sep 179974.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Ludwik Stanisław Górski:
Bishop Ludwik Stanisław Górski Sch. P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 137, and Page 454
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016