Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Luboradzki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

Titular Bishop of Tanis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1764BornPlock
26 Jun 180541.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
26 Jun 180541.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
25 May 180641.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
14 Apr 182257.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Luboradzki:
Bishop Antoni Luboradzki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,774
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 357
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1805, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015