Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Seweryn Tytus Morawski-Dąbrowa

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1819Born
24 Aug 185132.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv, Ukraine
31 Aug 185132.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
13 May 188162.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
13 May 188162.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
26 Jun 188162.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
15 Feb 188566.1SelectedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
27 Mar 188566.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
2 May 190081.3DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Seweryn Tytus Morawski-Dąbrowa (VIAF: 161191394)
Archbishop Seweryn Tytus Morawski-Dąbrowa (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiołko, Archdiocese of Lviv
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lviv, Archdiocese of Lviv

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 339, and Page 562
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017