Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Grzegorz Józef Romaszkan

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1809BornKuty
23 Aug 183425.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Aug 183425.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 187566.8SelectedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
3 Apr 187667.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
30 Apr 187667.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
11 Dec 188172.8DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Grzegorz Józef Romaszkan:
Archbishop Grzegorz Józef Romaszkan (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,788
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013