Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacy Łobos

Deceased

Bishop of Tarnów, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1827Born
31 Aug 185124.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Sep 185124.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 188254.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
27 Mar 188254.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
16 Apr 188254.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
15 Dec 188558.3SelectedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
15 Jan 188658.4ConfirmedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
15 Apr 190072.6DiedBishop of Tarnów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Łobos (VIAF: 232469658)
Bishop Ignacy Łobos (born , died ) Bishop of Tarnów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrohobycz, Diocese of Przemyśl
Ordained BishopSacre-Coeur, Chapel, Kraków, Diocese of Kraków

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 341, and Page 536
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017