Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Vartan Estegar, C.M.Vd. †

Deceased

Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna

Titular Archbishop of Selymbria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1843¹Born
1867¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna
19 Sep 188441.7AppointedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna
19 Sep 188441.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selymbria
9 Nov 188441.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Selymbria
23 Jun 188643.4DiedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Vartan Estegar (VIAF: 170090074)
Archbishop Joseph Vartan Estegar C.M.Vd. (born 1843, died ) Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzamos-Ujvarien
Ordained BishopWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

  • a priest for 19.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 512
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 54
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,652

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast