Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustav de Belrupt-Tissac

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Germanicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1818Born
1 Aug 184223.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Aug 184223.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 188062.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
13 Dec 188062.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicia
6 Jan 188162.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicia
9 Jun 189576.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Gustav de Belrupt-Tissac (VIAF: 84411716)
Bishop Gustav de Belrupt-Tissac (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTroppau, Archdiocese of Olomouc
Ordained BishopOlomouc, Archdiocese of Olomouc

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 285
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017