Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist Nogáll

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

Titular Bishop of Pergamum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1820Born
3 Jun 184322.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Jul 184323.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 188059.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
27 Feb 188059.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
14 Mar 188059.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
19 Jul 189979.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Nogáll (VIAF: 251926507)
Bishop Johann Baptist Nogáll (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGyör, Diocese of Győr (Raab), Hungary
Ordained BishopSeckau, Diocese of Seckau, Austria
Death PlaceGroßwardein, Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 447
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017