Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Narsete Djindoyan, C.A.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Musc (Armenian), Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1848Born
31 May 189244.0AppointedBishop of Musc (Armenian), Armenia
Aug 1892²44.2Ordained BishopBishop of Musc (Armenian), Armenia
10 Aug 190961.2DiedBishop of Musc (Armenian), Armenia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Narsete Djindoyan
Bishop Narsete Djindoyan C.A.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Musc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKawatar

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 397
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1892, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017