Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ferahian

Deceased

Bishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1834Born
16 Sep 188450.4AppointedBishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Armenian), Turkey
19 Oct 188450.5Ordained BishopBishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Armenian), Turkey
1894¹59.7DiedBishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ferahian
Bishop Joseph Ferahian (born , died 1894) Bishop of Diarbekir (Amida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamascus
Ordained BishopArmenian, Cathedral, Istanbul

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 96
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1884, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017